THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
14/05/24 22:43:47 PM
Govindarajulu, Arun Prasad
CPSO#:
85866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARUN PRASAD GOVINDARAJULU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVINDARAJULU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 09 Feb 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2011 |