THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:37:12 AM
Abidullah, Mohammad
CPSO#:
85841
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brandon Regional Health Authority
Westman Regional Laboratory
150 McTavish Avenue East Rm L 108A
Brandon MB R7A 7H8
Phone: (204) 578-4480
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ABIDULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABIDULLAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2009 |