THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:42:10 AM
Cakarevic, Svetlana
CPSO#:
85810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Apple Tree Medical Centre
2575B Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 7B3
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 726-3560
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 22, 2017, Queensway Carleton Hospital (QCH) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act, that in August 2017, Dr. Cakarevic resigned her privileges at QCH during the course of an investigation by QCH into her practice at QCH.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:21 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SVETLANA CAKAREVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAKAREVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2020 |