THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:35:13 PM
Santos, Gilda Da Cunha
CPSO#:
85805
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Fundacao Universidade Federal de Sergipe, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Scaranelo & Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011
Corporation Name: Dr. Gilda C. Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |