THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 17:20:09 PM
Rampure, Jaideep Mahadevappa
CPSO#:
85552
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
20 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Jul-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada
Education: Gulbarga University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2019 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 20 Jul 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 11, 2019, Dr. Rampure has undertaken to cease to practise:
Dr. Rampure has currently ceased to practise in Ontario and will give the College 15 days notice when he intends to return to practice.