THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:55:38 PM
Tidd, Christopher Mark
CPSO#:
85547
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State University of New York, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. Tidd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |