THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:39:02 PM
candia, pascual Remberto
CPSO#:
85512
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2180 Itabashi Way
Unit B2
Burlington ON L7M 5A5
Phone: 9053318800
Fax: 9053198676
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Mar 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PASCUAL REMBERTO CANDIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2006 to 07 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |