THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:35:26 AM
Al-Qadhi, Samim Aziz Arif
CPSO#:
85445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
782 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3H5
Phone: 5196015437
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMIM AZIZ ARIF AL-QADHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-QADHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Jul 2011 to 12 Oct 2011
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2016 |