THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:13:00 AM
Lim, Dianne Durante
CPSO#:
85239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
01 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue 2nd floor
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Phone: 4168131500
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANNE DURANTE LIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LIM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;
(2) Dr. LIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |