THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:46:14 PM
Krema, Muhammed Hatem Abdel Aleem
CPSO#:
85106
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
Floor 18 Room 606
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 5524
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Krema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
|
Active |