THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:03:31 PM
Wat, Shiu Yan Josephine
CPSO#:
84986
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Hospital Campus
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43897
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Josephine Wat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 10 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIU YAN JOSEPHINE WAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 02 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2010 |