THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:10:13 AM
Kalia, Lorraine Victoria
CPSO#:
84739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital UHN
Movement Disorders Clinic
McL 7th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORRAINE VICTORIA KALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |