THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:50:21 PM
Castellucci, Lana Antoinette
CPSO#:
84595
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall General Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LANA ANTOINETTE CASTELLUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTELLUCCI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 28 Mar 2011 to 08 May 2011
EL - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2011 |