THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:43:10 PM
Clouthier, Justin
CPSO#:
84574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
327 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON K9J 0B2
Phone: 7057758272
Fax: 7057439912
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Clouthier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 11 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:11 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUSTIN CLOUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLOUTHIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |