THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:43:00 PM
Erdmann, Natalie Irene
CPSO#:
84568
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sochocky, Natalie Irene (used until: 31 May 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2802-199 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 0H4
Phone: 905-780-1470
Fax: 647-699-9812
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE IRENE ERDMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERDMANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |