THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:47:29 PM
Min, Soh-Yoon
CPSO#:
84567
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Korean
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room 3G 103
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905)521-7978
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOH-YOON MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 17 May 2011 to 16 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 17 May 2012 to 16 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 17 May 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2013 |