THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:58:09 PM
Woods, Terence Christopher Hendrick
CPSO#:
84566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Arnprior & District Memorial Hosp
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Phone: 613-623-3166
Fax: 613-623-2430
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERENCE CHRISTOPHER HENDRICK WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2023 |