THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:45:46 PM
Sathiaseelan, Seyon
CPSO#:
84544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: (905) 883-2138
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Nov 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEYON SATHIASEELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHIASEELAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 03 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 04 May 2010 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2010 |