THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:27:01 PM
Lam, David Lieude
CPSO#:
84536
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp
Department of Emergency Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID LIEUDE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 Dec 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 19, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)