THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:41:07 AM
Tilley, Alison Ellen
CPSO#:
84523
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
209-1005 Elgin St W
Cobourg ON K9A 5J4
Phone: 9053734366
Fax: 9053730687
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISON ELLEN TILLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2012 |