THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:04:12 PM
Subramanian, Ganesh Kutala
CPSO#:
84522
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Sleep Laboratory
Suite 202
5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 622-3266
Fax: (416) 622-7831
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:04 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GANESH KUTALA SUBRAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBRAMANIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Sep 2010 to 17 Oct 2010
EL - Respirology
University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 06 Feb 2011
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |