THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:29:43 AM
Yudin, Alexandra
CPSO#:
84512
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Prime Care FHT
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 878-6793
Fax: (905) 878-6711
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA YUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUDIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2009 |