THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:59:13 AM
Smith, Barry Jay
CPSO#:
84501
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1600 Scott St
Health Canada
Office of Clinical Trials
5th Floor
Ottawa ON K1Y 4N7
Phone: 613-946-7996
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY JAY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2009 |