THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:34:39 PM
Walker, Michelle Louise
CPSO#:
84482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LOUISE WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2012 |