THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:40:22 PM
Wilson, Colin Graham
CPSO#:
84480
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLIN GRAHAM WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 03 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 14 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2012 |