THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:31:04 PM
Wong, Kim Tze-Shing
CPSO#:
84455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIM TZE-SHING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2012 |