THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:25:25 PM
Grynspan, Bernard
CPSO#:
84450
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Student Wellness Centre
Peter George Center for Living and
Level 2
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 27700
Fax: 1 855 383 4077
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BERNARD GRYNSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYNSPAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |