THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:28:01 PM
Simpson, Jory Sasha
CPSO#:
84433
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Surgery
Room 3 005
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5804
Fax: (416) 864-5821
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JORY SASHA SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |