THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:18:42 AM
Gupta, Anjalee Shilpa
CPSO#:
84426
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Market Square
2130 North Park Drive
Unit 247
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 595-1587
Fax: 855-680-6800
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANJALEE SHILPA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2008 |