THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:29:54 PM
Brager, Rae Lianne
CPSO#:
84417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Koffman, Rae Lianne (used until: 03 Feb 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-4968
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:27 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAE LIANNE BRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAGER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2013 |