THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:25:30 PM
Timpson, Jody Lee
CPSO#:
84407
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Murray, Jody Lee (used until: 24 Sep 2018 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 464
Carp ON K0A 1L0
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
Tel: (613) 256-9370
Date Received: 11 Aug 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JODY LEE TIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMPSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2008 |