THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:05:41 AM
Solh, Ziad
CPSO#:
84398
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room D1-236A
800 Commissioners Rd E, PO Box 5010
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500 Ext. 56447
Fax: 519-685-8294
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZIAD SOLH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Transfusion Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Transfusion Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2012 |