THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:37:47 AM
Steiman, Amanda Joie
CPSO#:
84363
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Building
Suite 2-003, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4707
Fax: (416) 586-8489
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOIE STEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2011 |