THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:36:32 PM
Lamont, Samantha Jane
CPSO#:
84327
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Silverlinings Medical Centres Inc.
unit 4
472 Woodlawn rd E
Guelph ON N1E 1B9
Phone: (519) 821-9449
Fax: (519) 821-9559
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JANE LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2009 |