THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:24:03 AM
Holler, Theresa Anne Marie
CPSO#:
84323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 410
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Phone: 289-856-9933
Fax: 905-901-5550
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THERESA ANNE MARIE HOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2011 |