THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:03:17 PM
Venantius, Michelle Ann
CPSO#:
84304
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Notre Dame House
14 Cannon St. W
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON L8R 2B3
Phone: (905) 308-8090
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANN VENANTIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENANTIUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2014 |