THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:00:05 AM
Kwapis, Jessica Joy
CPSO#:
84297
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Westerholm, Jessica Joy (used until: 25 May 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Nepali
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105 Progress Crescent, Suite #9
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3J4
Phone: 705-335-5115
Fax: 705-335-5040
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA JOY KWAPIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAPIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2011 |