THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:12:20 AM
Jerome, Amanda Lee
CPSO#:
84284
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
602-2319 Fairview St
Burlington, ON
L7R 2E3
Burlington ON L7R 2E3
Phone: (905) 635-3632
Fax: (905) 336-9220
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDA LEE JEROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEROME is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2010 |