THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:29:40 PM
Manji, Arif
CPSO#:
84260
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARIF MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |