THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:35:55 AM
Chung, Arthur Guozhi
CPSO#:
84241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
330 West St
Brantford ON N3R 7V5
Phone: (519) 732-7703
Fax: (833) 379-2559
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARTHUR GUOZHI CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |