THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:18:35 PM
Amin-Hussain, Fatima
CPSO#:
84235
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Amin, Parsa Fatima (used until: 24 Mar 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chinguacousy and Sandalwood
Medical Centre
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON L7A 0N5
Phone: (905) 840-4343
Fax: (905) 840-4303
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATIMA AMIN-HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN-HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2023 |