THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:59:31 PM
Dust, Nicholas Lorne Drouin
CPSO#:
84232
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS LORNE DROUIN DUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2011 |