THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:01:15 AM
El-Chaar, Darine Georges
CPSO#:
84231
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:08 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARINE GEORGES EL-CHAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-CHAAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2010 to 08 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 09 Jun 2011 to 08 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2014 |