THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:15:20 AM
Mackenzie, Constance Alexa
CPSO#:
84222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street, Rm B2-047
London, ON
N6A 4V
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 66065
Fax: 519-646-6119
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:07 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Pharmacology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CONSTANCE ALEXA MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |