THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:53:26 PM
Hadi, Mohammed
CPSO#:
84220
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Port Dover Doctor's Office
North Shore Centre
3- 697 Highway 6
Unit 3
Port Dover ON N0A 1N2
Phone: (519) 583-0893
Fax: 519-583-0010
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2009 |