THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:07:08 AM
Gambarotta, Nicola
CPSO#:
84219
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 Richmond Park Dr, Greater Napanee
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 Jul 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLA GAMBAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBAROTTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 09 Dec 2008 to 02 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 03 Nov 2009 to 02 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 03 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2011 |