THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:02:43 PM
Loo, Wei Jing
CPSO#:
84214
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
DermEffects
1560 Hyde Park Road
London ON N6H 5L5
Phone: (519) 472-2929
Fax: (519) 472-8484
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:18 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WEI JING LOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 May 2006 to 01 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2006 to 08 Dec 2006
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |