THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:40:01 AM
Nery, Pablo Balbuena
CPSO#:
84207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Room H1285
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7271
Fax: (613) 696-7123
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:14 Jul 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 18 Jul 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 19 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |