THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:48:02 AM
Alnaji, Fuad Saeed A
CPSO#:
84154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Arabian Gulf University College of Medic, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Deptartment of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FUAD SAEED A ALNAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNAJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |