THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:18:19 AM
Yasufuku, Kazuhiro
CPSO#:
84143
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: Chiba Medical University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room EN 9N 957
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4290
Fax: (416) 340-3660
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Japan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:28 Aug 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 07 Jun 2006
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |